FRIENDS OF WESTONBIRT ARBORETUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Westonbirt Arboretum operates the membership scheme for Westonbirt, the National Arboretum in Gloucestershire. It aims to further public enjoyment and knowledge of this world renowned tree collection and to secure its sustainable future through engaging and informing visitors and members and by giving financial and practical support for the management and development of the site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,204,896
Donations and legacies | £242.51k | |
Charitable activities | £1.44m | |
Other trading activities | £491.40k | |
Investments | £34.20k | |
Other | £181 |
Total expenditure:
£2,126,077
Raising funds | £552.26k | |
Charitable activities | £1.57m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £552.26k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.57m | |
Retained for future use | £78.82k |
People

23 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- FOWA (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF WESTONBIRT ARBORETUM (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF WESTONBIRT ARBORETUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Victoria Skuse | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Robert Allman | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Elizabeth Hare | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ballard | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bryars | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Addadahine | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Isherwood | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sian Troupe | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Owen Forster | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Walker | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Douglas Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43m | £1.64m | £1.87m | £1.98m | £2.20m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02m | £1.34m | £1.72m | £2.00m | £2.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.96k | £38.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £178.21k | £72.48k | £51.32k | £66.86k | £242.51k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £21.82k | £245.80k | £355.30k | £448.14k | £491.40k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.23m | £1.26m | £1.38m | £1.42m | £1.44m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.00k | £2.74k | £357 | £5.60k | £34.20k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £54.96k | £88.97k | £39.10k | £181 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £65.00k | £6.12k | £0 | £19.00k | £19.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £1.03m | £1.31m | £1.46m | £1.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.88k | £312.53k | £414.86k | £539.43k | £552.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.42k | £18.18k | £0 | £10.78k | £29.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £202.96k | £15.58k | £89.56k | £159.02k | £221.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £82.53k | £75.32k | £59.65k | £58.14k | £54.01k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.43m | £1.74m | £2.05m | £2.03m | £2.09m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £636.38k | £644.76k | £788.26k | £787.80k | £1.36m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE FRIENDS OF WESTONBIRT ARBORETUM AIMS TO FURTHER PUBLIC ENJOYMENT AND KNOWLEDGE OF THIS WORLD RENOWNED TREE COLLECTION AND TO SECURE ITS SUSTAINABLE FUTURE. IT DOES THIS BY ENGAGING, INFORMING AND INCREASING ITS MEMBERSHIP AND ALSO BY GIVING FINANCIAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO THE MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF WESTONBIRT, THE NATIONAL ARBORETUM AND, IN PARTICULAR, BY: 1. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THE NATIONAL ARBORETUM AT WESTONBIRT IN PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF THE CRITICAL ROLE OF TREES TO THE ENVIRONMENT AND SOCIETY; 2. PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THE ARBORETUM’S RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN ALL FIELDS RELATING TO TREES; 3. PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE UNIQUE TREE AND COLLECTION AND HISTORIC LANDSCAPE FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS; 4. PROVIDING FUNDS TO ENHANCE THE PUBLIC’S EXPERIENCE AT THE ARBORETUM; 5. ACTING AS AN ADVOCATE FOR THE ARBORETUM, PROMOTING ITS VALUES AND THE NEED FOR CONTINUING FUNDING; 6. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THE ARBORETUM BY CULTIVATING THE CHARITY’S RELATIONSHIP WITH ITS MEMBERS SO AS TO ENCOURAGE LONG-TERM RELATIONSHIPS AND FUNDRAISING OPPORTUNITIES; 7. PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR ACCESS AND PARTICIPATION TO A DIVERSE RANGE OF PUBLIC INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS; 8. PROVIDING FUNDS FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS WILL FURTHER THE WORK OF THE ARBORETUM
Area of benefit
TETBURY IN GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Linked charities
- 12 January 2004 : Standard registration
- 15 September 2004 : Removed
- 15 September 2004 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Great Oak Hall
Westonbirt Arboretum
Westonbirt
Tetbury
GL8 8QS
- Phone:
- 01666331770
- Email:
- Board@fowa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window