CHAPTER 1 CHARITY LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing hostel accommodation and ancillary services for vulnerable homeless men and women who have various needs; drug and alcohol abuse, young people leaving care, women with dependent children and men escaping domestic violence, refugees and asylum seekers and international students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income:
£18,551,000
Donations and legacies | £540.00k | |
Charitable activities | £17.97m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.00k | |
Other | £38.00k |
Total expenditure:
£18,266,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £18.27m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,147,860 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.27m | |
Retained for future use | £285.00k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 February 1992: Standard registration
- 15 November 1995: Removed
- CHAPTER 1 (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.92m | £13.97m | £16.39m | £17.64m | £18.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.50m | £12.96m | £16.57m | £17.98m | £18.27m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.07m | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.07m | £4.15m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £540.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £134.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.79m | £13.20m | £16.27m | £17.60m | £17.97m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £90.00k | £101.00k | £118.00k | £43.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £38.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.92m | £12.96m | £16.37m | £17.68m | £18.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £30.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £164.00k | £201.00k | £303.00k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.41m | £12.66m | £15.89m | £19.99m | £32.02m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.66m | £2.61m | £2.71m | £165.00k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.29m | £3.75m | £1.52m | £2.25m | £3.00m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | -£236.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.01m | £9.38m | £10.94m | £12.99m | £24.66m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 14 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 14 November 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/08/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE:- 3.1.1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, UNEMPLOYMENT, AGE OR OTHER NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY:- THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND HOSTEL ACCOMMODATION AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES; THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND LEISURE FACILITIES; THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVICE; AND THE PROVISION OF DIRECT AND INDIRECT FINANCIAL SUPPORT 3.1.3. ACTIVITIES IN PURSUANCE OF THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE UNDERTAKEN IN STRICT COMPLIANCE WITH AND OBEDIENCE TO THE FOUNDATION, AIMS AND DOCTRINAL BASIS OF THE CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (EXETER) LTD
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (GUILDFORD) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (LEAMINGTON SPA) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (LIVERPOOL) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (MANCHESTER) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (PEMBRIDGE SQUARE) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (SOUTHAMPTON) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (ST LEONARDS) LTD
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (TUNBRIDGE WELLS) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (WATERLOO) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (WESTON-SUPER MARE) LIMITED
- CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE HOUSING ASSOCIATION (YEOVIL) LTD
- 11 February 1992 : Standard registration
- 15 November 1995 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window