Governing document CHAPTER 1 CHARITY LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/08/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE:- 3.1.1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, UNEMPLOYMENT, AGE OR OTHER NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY:- THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND HOSTEL ACCOMMODATION AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES; THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND LEISURE FACILITIES; THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVICE; AND THE PROVISION OF DIRECT AND INDIRECT FINANCIAL SUPPORT 3.1.3. ACTIVITIES IN PURSUANCE OF THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE UNDERTAKEN IN STRICT COMPLIANCE WITH AND OBEDIENCE TO THE FOUNDATION, AIMS AND DOCTRINAL BASIS OF THE CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.