FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise social activities and fund-raising events for both adults and children at the school. We raise funds to provide extra equipment and resources to enrich and improve the facilities available to the children of St Mary's School, 'extras' that would not normally be possible within the school budget.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 December 1985: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S J M SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry Hundleby | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Botheras | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH ORTON | Trustee | 09 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.34k | £2.44k | £2.78k | £7.32k | £7.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £3.47k | £858 | £4.14k | £3.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2024 | 634 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 July 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED 4TH OCTOBER 1990. AND 17TH SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Hawthorns
Ware
SG12 0XY
- Phone:
- 01920421093
- Email:
- kerrymunt@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window