LONDON AND SOUTH OF ENGLAND CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN THEATRE ORGAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To restore, maintain and present to the public theatre Organs. To promote learning to play and maintain these instruments especially to young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR PETER NICHOLAS ASHTON | Chair |
|
||||||
Peter Alexander Hicks | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Judith Anne Rawle | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Wooldridge | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Keith John Reeve | Trustee | 14 January 2012 |
|
|||||
PETER GEOFFREY COLLETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.51k | £4.97k | £8.48k | £100.43k | £16.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £3.41k | £5.86k | £61.45k | £19.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH OCTOBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ON 27TH APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF THEATRE ORGAN MUSIC. (B) TO ACQUIRE AND/OR RESTORE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HE PUBLIC THOSE THEATRE ORGANS WHICH ARE OF HISTORIC AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE. (C) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEATRE ORGAN MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Robeson Way
Borehamwood
WD6 5RY
- Phone:
- 07944285266
- Email:
- keith@wokingwurlitzer.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window