THE BETHERSDEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of Bethersden or for the general benefit of the inhabitants of Bethersden as the Trustees in their absolute discretion shall determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 19 December 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Kimber Johnson | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BUCKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SAM BUCKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/06/2020 | 29/06/2021 | 29/06/2022 | 29/06/2023 | 29/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.39k | £2.73k | £3.24k | £3.32k | £3.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.38k | £1.38k | £3.80k | £12.03k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 June 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 June 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 June 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH NOVEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF BETHERSDEN OR FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BETHERSDEN AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
BETHERSDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brushwood Hall
Bethersden
ASHFORD
Kent
TN26 3EU
- Phone:
- 01233820713
- Email:
- brushwood1@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window