THE BROADSTONE COMMUNITY AND ARTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving & using a 3-bedroom Victorian house as a Community Centre for all ages in a large garden & conservation area. Meaningful activities & education for advancement of young people & value in family life. Non-alcohol premises. Safe environment for women & children.Yoga,Tai Chi,Structured activities for elderly & unwell, Wellness, Ballet, Drama, Maths, English,Eat for Health, Table-tennis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 07 January 1986: Standard registration
- BROADSTONE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR D C BLAKE | Chair | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LARBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJOR ROBERT JAMES COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE HATTEMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.50k | £22.13k | £20.51k | £15.20k | £16.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.45k | £21.41k | £17.54k | £16.91k | £16.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OPINIONS THE ADVANCEMENT OF COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES PARTICIPATION IN AND ACCESS TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS EDUCATION SOCIAL WELFARE AND RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO PROMOTE THE ASSOCIATION OF THE LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ASSOCIATIONS CLUBS AND SOCIETIES AND THE INHABITANTS GENERALLY OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN A COMMON EFFORT FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE. 3. TO CONSTRUCT ADAPT OF ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE CONSTRUCTION ADAPTATION OR ESTABLISHMENT OF SUITABLE LAND AND BUILDINGS FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CENTRE AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES AND MEMBERS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO COOPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH LAND AND BUILDINGS
Area of benefit
BROADSTONE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 DUNYEATS ROAD
BROADSTONE
BH18 8AB
- Phone:
- 01202605504
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window