Financial history CMI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 293283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.51k £19.36k £21.26k £25.63k £25.66k
Total expenditure £24.90k £24.97k £2.68k £19.17k £11.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A