THE CINEMA MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The museum is open by appointment to visitors, researchers and historians. Film screenings are given throughout the year. We work with educational institutions on joint projects. We work with film archives on preservation projects. Items from the collection are made available on loan to other institutions for exhibitions. We run seasonal programmes of events which are listed on our website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Elizabeth Waldy | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Wood | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jon Davies | Trustee | 14 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHARLES HUMPHRIES | Trustee | 07 January 1986 |
|
|||||
TONY FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD GRAEME GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.79k | £141.65k | £117.46k | £224.61k | £187.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.48k | £91.00k | £135.79k | £159.24k | £160.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND NOVEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 3RD NOVEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PERFORMING ARTS, INCLUDING DRAMA, MUSIC, SINGING, ILLUSTRATION, LITERATURE FILM PHOTOGRAPHY, VIDEO AND ANY COMBINATION OF THESE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MASTER'S HOUSE
2 DUGARD WAY
LONDON
SE11 4TH
- Phone:
- 07985475382
- Email:
- info@cinemamuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window