Financial history EAST PRESTON AND KINGSTON VILLAGE HALL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 293292
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.14k £22.26k £33.64k £37.07k £43.16k
Total expenditure £67.27k £38.04k £36.41k £42.64k £35.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.74k N/A £8.00k £875 N/A