EAST PRESTON AND KINGSTON VILLAGE HALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Badminton, Table Tennis, Art. Bridge, Yoga, Zumba, Ballet, Ballroom Latin and Scottish Dancing, Cornhole, Public meetings and AGM's for community groups, Karate, Thai Chi, Cardiac Fitness, Lunch Club for over 55's, Pilates, Floral Club, Horticultural Shows, Festival events, Parish Council Events, Craft Fayres, Childrens clubs, Children's parties, Private Events. Community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 April 1986: Standard registration
- EAST PRESTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONI McELROY | Chair | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Penny | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Adams | Trustee | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Taggart | Trustee | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.14k | £22.26k | £33.64k | £37.07k | £43.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.27k | £38.04k | £36.41k | £42.64k | £35.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.74k | N/A | £8.00k | £875 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE TRUST DEED DATED 28TH APRIL 1982
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF EAST PRESTON AND KINGSTON, WEST SUSSEX, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF EAST PRESTON AND KINGSTON WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Preston&Kingston Village Hall
52 Sea Road
East Preston
LITTLEHAMPTON
West Sussex
BN16 1LP
- Phone:
- 07591 480815
- Email:
- Chair@epkvh.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window