BANCROFT'S DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bancroft's Decorative and Fine Arts Society is a member society of NADFAS - National Association of Decorative & Fine Arts - serving a mature suburban area on the Greater London / Essex borders. Its principal activity is to provide a competent programme of lectures, study days & visits on a wide range of art & art history topics. Monthly lectures are delivered by NADFAS approved lecturers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Enfield
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 16 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH PATTISON | Chair | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN THURLEY | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA TERVET | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY KNIGHTS | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.98k | £4.88k | £15.96k | £19.77k | £14.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.22k | £6.94k | £12.83k | £19.73k | £19.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 June 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED 12TH NOVEMBER 1985 AND 13 NOVEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED 9 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF AESTHETIC EDUCATION, THE CULTIVATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
St. Johns Lodge
St. Johns Road
LOUGHTON
Essex
IG10 1RZ
- Phone:
- 02085055045
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window