NETHERFIELD CHILDREN'S CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
After School Club and holiday playscheme for school aged children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 14 January 1986: Standard registration
- 25 September 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 25 September 2017: Funds transferred to 295107 MILTON KEYNES COMMUNITY FOUNDATION LIMITED
- NETHERFIELD CHILDREN'S CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.69k | £55.26k | £61.12k | £95.57k | £104.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.68k | £51.89k | £59.05k | £98.25k | £97.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 16 June 2017 | 502 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 28 August 2017 | 575 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 02 February 2015 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 02 February 2015 | 2 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 18TH JULY 1997
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE PROVISION OF THE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING AREA, BEING FACILITIES OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS, AND WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN MILTON KEYNES (3) TO ORGANISE HOLIDAYS AND OUTINGS FOR NEEDY AND DEPRIVED CHILDREN IN MILTON KEYNES.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window