TICK TOCK PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playgroup for 4 month olds to 5 year olds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Swindon
Governance
- 06 January 1987: Standard registration
- MILLBROOK NURSERY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie McNulty | Chair | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chiron Smith | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hunter | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Court | Trustee | 08 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.97k | £344.29k | £269.72k | £325.16k | £369.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.05k | £388.71k | £287.25k | £331.33k | £392.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £339.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2024
(These accounts |
04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/11/1986 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/1995 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULORY SCHOOL AGE BY (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING PLAY, IN WHICH PRENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN. (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tick Tock Playgroup
Hall Close
Wroughton
SWINDON
SN4 9LD
- Phone:
- 01793814191
- Email:
- enquiry.ticktock@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window