FRIENDS OF WHEATFIELDS INFANTS AND NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of pupils of Wheatfields Infants' and Nursery School by: providing and assisting in the provision of such facilities or items for education at the school as the committee and the school shall from time to time determine; fostering co-operation between the parents and the school; and engaging in activities which support the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 January 1986: Standard registration
- 21 January 2025: Funds received from 1079558 THE MARK LINDGREN MEMORIAL FUND
- WHEATFIELDS INFANTS' AND NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WHEATFIELDS INFANTS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Gaygusuz | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rehana Ahmed | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Carlson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Claire Potter | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Kassel | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Louise Rothwell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.40k | £26.72k | £22.44k | £30.51k | £44.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.88k | £14.35k | £11.65k | £12.70k | £18.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2022
(These accounts |
16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 302 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/06/1984 AS AMENDED ON 15/06/1988 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/1996 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wheatfields Infant School
Downes Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL4 9NT
- Phone:
- 01727 859978
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window