AL-MUNTADA AL-ISLAMI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust strives to serve the community. It provides education, cultural, social and spiritual activities. Runs a primary school, secondary girls school, provides short ICT training courses, Arabic classes, classes in qur'an recitation, summer youth activities, holds conferences, seminars, lectures, provides counselling, organises pilgrimage trips, offers prayer facilities, and pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 1986: Standard registration
- AL MUNTADA PRIMARY SCHOOL (Working name)
- EDEN HIGH SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SAEED ALGADIE | Chair | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdullah Albagieh | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Salah Taifoor | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|||||
ABDUL HAKEEM MONTAGUE | Trustee | 01 January 1987 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39m | £354.54k | £454.03k | £267.45k | £408.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46m | £386.14k | £380.52k | £362.98k | £352.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £443.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £810.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £136.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.46m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £33.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/12/1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/02/1993
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH); 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY WITHIN THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY; 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF MUSLIMS; 4. TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BRIDGES PLACE
FULHAM
LONDON
SW6 4HW
- Phone:
- 02074718264
- Email:
- admin@almuntadatrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window