THE GREAT YARMOUTH TOY AND LEISURE LIBRARY FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 April 1986: Standard registration
- 10 January 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 10 January 2006: Funds transferred to 1111097 SHINE (EAST NORFOLK)
- GREAT YARMOUTH TOY LIBRARY (Working name)
- GREAT YARMOUTH TOY AND LEISURE LIBRARIES FOR PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH NOVEMBER 1985. AMENDED 10TH FEBRUARY 1986 AND COPY OF THE MINUTES DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1996. AND REVISED 9TH DECEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HANDICAPPED AND NON-HANDICAPPED CHILDREN FOR THEIR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION SUCH AS THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL OR STIMULATING TOYS. (B) TO PROVIEDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL OR RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR ADULTS WHO ARE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window