Friends of Amberley School

Charity number: 293394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parent / Teacher association raising funds for school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £23,058
Total expenditure: £18,309

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Friends of Amberley School (Working name)
  • AMBERLEY PAROCHIAL SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Keillor Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Rachael Biles Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Stephen David George Tarr Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.22k £3.58k £21.33k £20.14k £23.06k
Total expenditure £3.68k £19.33k £9.60k £20.85k £18.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 July 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Amberley Parochial School
Amberley
STROUD
GL5 5JG
Phone:
01453873349