THE PERIVALE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our specific role is for the promotion of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ. In Perivale we are a witness by our presence and work. We meet and talk with people seeking faith. We offer help and advice based on the Bible and our Christian faith to people with problems and prayer. From our Bookshop in Perivale we sell Bibles and Christian product to help and support churches and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 10 February 1986: Standard registration
- CHRISTNETBOOKS (Working name)
- PERIVALE CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP (Working name)
- PERIVALE CHRISTIAN DISTRIBUTORS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev COLIN EDWARD TAYLOR | Chair |
|
||||||
MARTIN HARRY DEADMAN | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN KEITH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 05 December 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH DAY OF JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE ARE:- TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PERIVALE CHRISTIAN CENTRE
90 BILTON ROAD
PERIVALE
GREENFORD
UB6 7BN
- Phone:
- 02089982933
- Email:
- sales@christnetbooks.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window