THE WATLING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of grants for religious activities medical expenses and relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 20 January 1986: Standard registration
- 17 January 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 17 January 2011: Funds transferred to 801465 CENTRAL HARDSHIP AND RELIEF TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24 | £191 | £917 | £1.26k | £748 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £850 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 19 March 2010 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 03 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 06 February 2008 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 05 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1985 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
I. RELIEF OF POVERTY OF THE BRETHREN AND .A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVISION OF ACCOMODATION FOR THE BRETHREN IN NEED, B) TO PROVIDE FOR THE CURE OR MITIGATION OR PREVENTION OF OR CARE OF MEMBERS OF THE BRETHREN SUFFERING FROM OR SUBJECT TO ANY ILLNESS ETC (INCLUDING CARE OF WOMEN BEFORE,DURING OR AFTER CHILDBIRTH).II. CARRYING ON THE SERVICE OF GOD INCLUDING CELEBRATION OF THE LORD SUPPER ETC. III. THE ADVANCEMENT OF OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE BRETHREN. (SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT FOR FULL OBJECTS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window