THE EVA COLORNI MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives bursaries to Economics students at London Metropolitan University suffering financial hardship. Organises public lectures once every 18-24 months (on average).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- City Of London
- Islington
Governance
- 22 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Aarti Rughoo | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
LORD NICHOLAS STERN KT PBA FRS | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Soodabeh Tootoonchian | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lord Layard | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mary Kaldor | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR AMARTYA SEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRIS ELVEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr STEPHANIE BARRIENTOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DIANE PERRONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANK RODRIGUEZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KABIR SEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
INDRANI SEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.95k | £21.05k | £3.65k | £3.93k | £4.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.12k | £12.10k | £8.82k | £10.12k | £10.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17TH MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING AND ADMINISTERING A BURSARY TO ENABLE A NEEDY MEMEBER OF THE PUBLIC TO STUDY ECONOMICS AT THE CITY OF LONDON POLYTECHNIC. (II) TO ADVANCE EDCATION BY ARRANGING OCCASIONAL PUBLIC LECTURES IN ECONOMIC TOPICS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Metropolitan University
Faculty of Business and Law
166-220 Holloway Road
London
N7 8DB
- Phone:
- 07749821603
- Email:
- chris.elven@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window