MONTFORT HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity manages the community hall which is available for hire by the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHARINE ANNE WARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CLLR MARK GEOFFRY COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY PERRIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Councillor John Stephen Parker | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.59k | £7.07k | £6.62k | £7.61k | £5.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.19k | £10.41k | £9.38k | £9.35k | £7.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH JUNE 1985
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TADBURN WARD IN THE PARISH OF ROMSEY AND THE ADJACENT AREA IN THE PARISH OF ROMSEY EXTRA BOUNDED TO THE NORTH AND WEST BY THE RAILWAY LINES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
TADBURN WARD IN THE PARISH OF ROMSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 SENLAC ROAD
ROMSEY
SO51 5RE
- Phone:
- 07717500790
- Email:
- kateward3@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window