THE NORTH INDIA OUTREACH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The proclamation and furtherance of the Gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ and in particular to support the charitable work of North India Outreach Society ( a non-profit making charitable body registered in New Delhi, India).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 19 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE PETER WICKS | Chair | 17 December 1985 |
|
|||||||||
Rev THOMAS SHAW | Trustee | 17 December 1985 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.37k | £10.06k | £1.20k | £2.91k | £1.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 17TH DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
A. THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. B. TO REACH OUT TO MEET THE NEEDS OF THE PEOPLE THROUGHOUT NORTH INDIA, IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF NORTH INDIA OUTREACH SOCIETY A NON-PROFIT MAKING CHARITABLE BODY REGISTERED IN NEW DELHI, INDIA. C. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING AND SETTING UP SELF HELP PROGRAMMES, AS WELL AS HELPING PEOPLE IN AN EMBERGENCY. D. TO PROVIDE PREVENTATIVE MEDICAL HELP AS WELL AS PROVIDING MEDICAL CARE TO THE SICK AND NEEDY REGARDLESS OF RELIGION RACE OR SOCIAL STATUS. E. TO ENGAGE IN EDUCATIONAL WORK, THE FOUNDING OF, CONDUCTING AND MAINTAINING SCHOOLS SEMINARIES AND TRAINING CENTRE. F. TO PROVIDE CHURCH BUILDINGS AND TO TRAIN AND MAINTAIN CHURCH WORKERS TO DEAL WITH THE VARIOUS PROBLEMS AND NEEDS OF THE PEOPLE THEY REACH OUT TO HELP. G. TO DO ANY OTHER RELIGIOUS WORK OF CHARITY WHICH WILL HELP PEOPLE SOCIALLY, PHYSICALLY, MENTALLY AND SPIRITUALLY. H. TO SUPPORT OR HELP OUT OF THE FUNDS OF THE TRUST ANY CHRISTIAN WORKER OR MISSIONARY WHEREVER RESIDENT WHO WILL BE INVOLVED IN THE WORK OF THE TRUST IN A PROMOTIONAL OF FUND RAISING CAPACITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPENCER HOUSE
MORSTON COURT
AISECOME WAY
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS22 8NG
- Phone:
- 01934620011
- Email:
- terry@burton-sweet.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window