Accounts and annual returns PENZANCE NATURAL HEALTH CENTRE

Charity Number: 293458
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 13 August 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 December 2022 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window