Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH GOUDHURST

Charity number: 293470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 08 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 March 2022 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required