Trustees E L M V SHADWELL BASIN PROJECT
Charity number: 293475

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elias Roman | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Thomas | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Brown | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Moules | Trustee | 18 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Keep | Trustee | 30 December 2017 |
|
|||||
DANIEL ABEL | Trustee | 20 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PENNY BRUCE-WALKER - Vice Chair | Trustee | 19 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS NATHANIEL HENDERSON | Trustee | 14 September 1992 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.