SYLVANIA PLAY AND COMMUNITY FACILITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide recreational and other leisure time activities for children and other inhabitants of Pennsylvania, Exeter, and its immediate surroundings, in the interests of social welfare. Also to advance the education of children below compulsory school age, by providing or assisting in the provision of facilities for group play, in which parents can participate when appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 17 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lawrence Alistair Friedrich Schneck | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Julian Niel Barker-Hahlo | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ELSTOB MIMMACK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.76k | £5.56k | £11.81k | £10.32k | £8.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.21k | £8.07k | £9.84k | £15.63k | £10.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 October 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2023 | 335 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR GROUP PLAY IN WHIC THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS CAN PARTICIPATE WHEN APPROPRIATE. II) TO ADVANCE RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND OTHER INHABITANTS OF SYLVANIA PARK, EXETER AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, THAT THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS MAY BE IMPROVED. SUCH PERSONS HAVING NEED OF THE FACILITIES BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CICUSTANCES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
SYLVANIA PARK, EXETER AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sylvania Hall
Mincinglake Valley Park
Stoke Hill
Exeter
EX4 7DR
- Phone:
- 07806305633
- Email:
- info@sylvaniahall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window