CLOCKMAKERS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Intended to help Freemen of the Clockmakers' Company and their widows and dependants or persons who are or have been engaged in the clock and watchmaking industry and their widows and other dependants who are in need, hardship or distress by making grants of money or paying for items, services or facilities to reduce the need, hardship or distress, where trust funds are available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- City Of London
Governance
- 14 April 1986: Standard registration
- 04 October 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47 | £75 | £59 | £49 | £77 | |
|
Total expenditure | £47 | £75 | £59 | £49 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 17 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 10 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | 18 March 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 07 September 2007 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 12 February 2007 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 31ST JULY 1985
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE EITHER FREEMAN OF THE CLOCKMAKERS' COMPANY AND THEIR WIDOWS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OR PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE TO AT ANY TIME BEEN ENGAGED IN THE CLOCK AND WATCHMAKING INDUSTRY AND THEIR WIDOWS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window