FOREST ROAD UNEMPLOYED COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Eductional and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 January 1986: Standard registration
- FOREST OF DEAN TC PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Lougher | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Flower | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Holder | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA STRATFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £26.00k | £10.36k | £25.06k | £3.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.23k | £12.30k | £10.34k | £9.76k | £17.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATON INCORPORATED 1ST JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN YOUNG AND OTHER UNEMPLOYED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE FOREST OF DEAN WHO THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE RESIDENTS.TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES RESIDENT IN THE AREA.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL PROBLEMS THAT RESULT FROM SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION.TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE POOR BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY WORKSHOP, ACCOMMODATION AND TRAINING IN BUSINESS MANAGEMENT.
Area of benefit
FOREST OF DEAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOREST ROAD
CINDERFORD
GLOS
GL14 2NT
- Phone:
- 01594821112
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window