Friends of St John's and St Nic's

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster good, open relations and communications within the school community, between parents and school staff. To run a programme of events and activities throughout the year designed to: A: Promote the PTA's first aim; B: To provide additional funds for the school to purchase extra equipment, and C: Engage in activities and experiences to enrich the childrens opportunities at school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 20 January 1986: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST SCHOOL, NEWBURY (Previous name)
- ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST (CONTROLLED) SCHOOL PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Worley | Chair | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephina Harrison-Harvey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Devonshire | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/09/2019 | 15/09/2020 | 15/09/2021 | 15/09/2022 | 15/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.00k | £10.08k | £5.25k | £5.43k | £12.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.13k | £21.94k | £6.71k | £6.37k | £8.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 September 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/1985 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2012 as amended on 15 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John the Evangelist C.E. Nursery & Infant Sch
Old Newtown Road
Newbury
Berkshire
RG14 7DE
- Phone:
- 07793 869002
- Email:
- fosjsnschools@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window