Financial history KETTERING CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 293503
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £129.48k £131.61k £128.60k £93.19k £114.94k
Total expenditure £129.29k £126.96k £127.37k £103.22k £105.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A