ROMAN MILITARY RESEARCH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Displays at public sites on aspects of Roman Military and Civilian life mainly based around First Century research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Germany
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HATCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MR ALEX KRACKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL GEDDES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Michael Haxell | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/11/2019 | 17/11/2020 | 17/11/2021 | 17/11/2022 | 17/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.98k | £530 | £0 | £4.42k | £2.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.28k | £12.46k | £4.85k | £3.56k | £3.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 November 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 November 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 November 2021 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 November 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 November 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 20TH NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE ROMAN ARMY AND ITS CIVILIAN COMPONENT BY PRESENTING SCHOOL TALKS, LECTURES, STATIC DISPLAYS AND DRILL. (B) TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH AND EXPERIMENTATION ON THE PRACTICAL HISTORICAL ASPECTS OF THE ROMAN MILITARY SYSTEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 HILLSIDE AVENUE
KETTERING
NN15 6EF
- Phone:
- 01536521502
- Email:
- hewhax@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window