HORHAM AND ATHELINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Victorian Old School Village Hall, in a village of 350, is used for fund raising events for the Church, quiz evenings, coffee mornings etc. Rapper and folk music and Morris Dancers use the hall it is is also hired out for private parties.Regular Wednesday morning Coffee, Cake and Chat and an internet cafe with instruction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Cooper | Chair | 31 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Edis | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Meri Peters | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Westwood | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Spencer Ryan | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS P FLORANCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH VICTOR HAWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAPHNE MARGARET HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.50k | £10.15k | £12.01k | £3.32k | £3.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £1.27k | £1.82k | £2.42k | £2.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED 25TH NOVEMBER 1985 as amended on 03 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF HORHAM AND ATHELINGTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ODCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HORHAM AND ATHELINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAK FARM
ATHELINGTON ROAD
HORHAM
EYE
IP21 5EH
- Phone:
- 01379384216
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window