Trustees ROTHWELL PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity Number: 293537

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew James Garner | Chair | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Doreen White | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Palmer | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jelley | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Johnson | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Beaton Mackay | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM SPENDLOVE | Trustee | 23 November 2012 |
|
|||||
RICHARD JAMES H LEY | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.