Financial history THE KINGS LYNN GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 293550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.41k £1.69k £9.02k £24.52k £24.52k
Total expenditure £4.85k £407 £14.99k £27.19k £27.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A