Financial history COBHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 293556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £111.34k £86.38k £64.53k £114.17k £116.35k
Total expenditure £76.54k £79.38k £54.99k £84.43k £128.16k
Income from government contracts £1.01k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.37k £10.00k £10.24k £2.67k N/A