GILES JOHNSON SEVEN SPRINGS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
grants to aid independent and daily living of disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 March 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDRA HELEN PENTECOST | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS WILLIAM GINGELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CHARLES GINGELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/03/2020 | 23/03/2021 | 23/03/2022 | 23/03/2023 | 23/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £775 | £570 | £438 | £573 | £367 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF VARIATION DATED 23RD DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE WELFARE OF DISABLED PERSONS (A) RESIDING THE THE SEVEN SPRINGS CHESHIRE HOME, PEMBURY ROAD, TUNBRIDGE WELLS, KENT; (B) RESIDING IN CHESHIRE HOMES MANAGED BY THE LEONARD CHESHIRE FOUNDATION GENERALLY: AND (C) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM GENERELLY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 STRATTON VILLA
MILBOURNE
MALMESBURY
SN16 9JB
- Phone:
- 01666822203
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window