Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH SUTTON TRUST

Charity number: 293616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.59k £221 £2.00k £4.82k £4.16k
Total expenditure £4.17k £7.84k £4.10k £6.01k £4.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A