METROPOLITAN COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY HAS A PRIMARY MINISTRY IN GAY, LESBIAN, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER COMMUNITIES, PROVIDING THE SAFE ENVIRONMENT OF AN ACCEPTING CONGREGATION WHERE PEOPLE CAN FIND GOD'S SALVATION, PERSONAL SUPPORT, SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND GUIDANCE TOWARD HEALTH AND WHOLENESS. THIS IS ACHIEVED THROUGH CELEBRATIVE WORSHIP SERVICES, SUPPORTIVE CARE GROUPS, COMMUNITY OUTREACH, JUSTICE, ADVOCACY AND SOCIAL ACTION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 November 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Angwyn Evans | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Alexander Sutherland | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helena Vernon-Jackson | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JON FELLOWS | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Wazana Sinyangwe | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Owoo | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PJ SAMUELS | Trustee | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GORE | Trustee | 23 October 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.55k | £25.56k | £30.21k | £37.32k | £39.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.94k | £30.03k | £29.31k | £34.60k | £39.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/10/1987 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2015
Charitable objects
(A) THE CHURCH IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST IN NORTH LONDON AND ELSEWHERE. (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG THE BENEFICIARIES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES WITHIN NORTH LONDON AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THE CHURCH SHALL APPLY ITS FUNDS ONLY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
NORTH LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Charles Street
Bush Hill Park
Enfield
EN1 1LD
- Phone:
- 020 8702 3679
- Email:
- richardgore@blueyonder.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window