Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THOMAS WOLSEY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 293635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.78k £19.46k £25.17k £17.64k £2.10k
Total expenditure £5.94k £1.33k £41.72k £8.22k £11.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A