BYFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust Property shall be held upon trust for the purposes of a Village Hall for the use of the inhabitants of Byfield and the neighbourhood without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions, and in particular for use for meetings, lectures and classes, and recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 14 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sima Johnston | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Withey | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Burdon | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Charters | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Condry | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Corbett | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bird | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Gillic | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pat Cannell | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.36k | £19.68k | £49.86k | £15.90k | £15.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.00k | £29.75k | £39.80k | £27.37k | £13.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £13.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 January 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1959
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BYFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BYFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 BODDINGTON ROAD
BYFIELD
DAVENTRY
NN11 6XT
- Phone:
- 01327260483
- Email:
- cannell@clara.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window