GLOUCESTER SPA AND PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 05 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1652 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1652 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TWO INDENTURES DATED 24TH DECEMBER 1861 AND 26TH DECEMBER 1861
Charitable objects
PUBLIC WALKS AND PLEASURE GROUNDS FOR THE RESORT AND RECREATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID CITY (OF GLOUCESTER) AND OTHERS RESORTING THERETO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window