Financial history ISLE OF WIGHT MUSIC, DANCE, AND DRAMA FESTIVAL

Charity number: 293658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £18.44k £4.30k £16.37k £17.75k £17.49k
Total expenditure £22.59k £4.87k £21.69k £21.24k £23.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £725 N/A £975 £1.21k £1.00k