Financial history PEACE COTTAGES CHARITY

Charity Number: 293663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £41.05k £36.35k £38.94k £32.54k £41.30k
Total expenditure £10.60k £53.35k £28.01k £39.02k £30.23k
Income from government contracts N/A £21.38k £9.14k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A