THE GROUNDWORK SOUTH TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In relation to its "Beneficial Area": 1. To promote conservation, protection and improvement of the physical/natural environment. 2. To implement recreation/leisure solutions which enhance social welfare in the community. 3. To advance public education in environmental/sustainability issues. 4. Via a social enterprise, contribute to wider national strategies on crime reduction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£9,361,404
Donations and legacies | £32.25k | |
Charitable activities | £9.33m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£9,319,720
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £9.32m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,910,269 from 29 government contract(s) and £635,291 from 23 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.32m | |
Retained for future use | £41.68k |
People

167 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
2500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 February 1986: Standard registration
- 02 April 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 29 October 1997: Standard registration
- 07 August 2013: Funds received from 1073049 GROUNDWORK SOLENT
- 13 August 2013: Funds received from 1050417 GROUNDWORK KENT & MEDWAY
- 03 July 2015: Funds received from 1099543 GOBLIN COMBE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE LIMITED
- GROUNDWORK THAMES VALLEY (Working name)
- THE COLNE VALLEY PARK GROUNDWORK TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE THAMES VALLEY GROUNDWORK TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Peter Head | Chair | 04 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Matthew Pearce | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Dowd | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Sutherland | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Joseph Davidson | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00m | £4.71m | £6.60m | £7.59m | £9.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.92m | £4.70m | £6.41m | £7.38m | £9.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.28m | £818.63k | £2.01m | £3.20m | £2.91m | |
|
Income from government grants | £113.36k | £212.85k | £377.95k | £1.06m | £635.29k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £37.79k | £16.90k | £29.82k | £34.64k | £32.25k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.97m | £4.69m | £6.57m | £7.56m | £9.33m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £34.64k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.92m | £4.70m | £6.41m | £7.38m | £9.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.50k | £0 | £7.50k | £7.50k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.05m | £1.03m | £1.01m | £995.78k | £981.32k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £882.55k | £743.05k | £2.03m | £1.65m | £2.99m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.42m | £2.25m | £3.32m | £2.72m | £4.00m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/01/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/07/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE GEOGRAPHIC COUNTIES IN THE SOUTH EAST AND SOUTH WEST REGIONS OF ENGLAND, AND THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREAS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW , AND THE DISTRICT OF THREE RIVERS ( THE BENEFICIAL AREA). AND; 2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE LIVING IN OR RESORTING TO THE BENEFICIAL AREA 3) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OF THE WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME WHERESOEVER 4)TO PROMOTE IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, THE CARE, RESETTLEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS AND THOSE AT RISK OF OFFENDING, AND TO SUPPORT THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS, WITHIN THE BENEFICIAL AREA IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY) BY PROVIDING, PROMOTING, SUPPORTING OR ORGANISING THE RECRUITMENT, EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS AND THOSE AT RISK OF OFFENDING, AND TO ASSIST THEM IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT AND ACCOMMODATION AND IN REHABILITATING THEMSELVES; 5) TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION OF CRIME BY SUPPORTING OR CARRYING ON EITHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY OTHER BODY, AUTHORITY OR PERSON ANY PROJECT OR SCHEME AND BY PROVIDING MONEY FOR SUCH PURPOSES WHETHER BY LOAN OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT DESCRIPTION
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROUNDWORK SOUTH
Colne Valley Park Centre
Denham Court Drive
Denham
Uxbridge
UB9 5PG
- Phone:
- 01895832662
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window