Accounts and annual returns ENGLISH SETTER RESCUE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 293708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 17 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 November 2023 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 April 2024 177 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required