Governing document COLCHESTER ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED ON 09 OCT 2019 as amended on 29 Nov 2019 as amended on 28 Nov 2019 as amended on 10 Dec 2019 as amended on 06 Feb 2020 as amended on 18 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The CICA's object shall be: 1. To advance the religion of Islam (Sunni doctrines) and offer religious services to the Muslim Community in order to promote Islamic culture and teachings; 2. To foster shared understanding in order to promote community cohesion, peace, racial harmony and tolerance necessary to develop and sustain better community relations;. 3. To provide humanitarian service to people affected by poverty, war, flood, famine and other natural disasters and enhance the quality of their life locally and internationally; 4. To offer advice, information, help and support to wider community and extend bridges of cooperation amongst different communities and work for the common good.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.