Financial history THE JUNIPERS TRUST

Charity number: 293763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.00k £4.25k £5.55k £4.71k £18
Total expenditure £8.89k £7.69k £9.98k £6.86k £1.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A