Accounts and annual returns THE ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 293782
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2008 15 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 01 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 08 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required