BERKSHIRE SCOUT ENTERPRISES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish workshops, projects and schemes for the training and provision of work experience for unemployed or disabled persons. To provide educational and training facilities for unemployed persons resident in the area of benefit. To assist any charitable organisation which is part of the Scouting Movement. To raise funds and to invite and receive contributions from any person/s.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 18 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Colin Ashworth | Chair | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Knight | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Marc Knight | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Loraine Stout | Trustee | 20 May 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.29k | £23.82k | £89.92k | £92.17k | £74.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.29k | £20.47k | £92.91k | £100.98k | £68.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £7.46k | £61.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.91k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 2ND AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
A. TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN YOUNGPERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WHO THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT OR WISH TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION AND TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT SCHEMES AND CENTRES WHERE SUCH PERSONS MAY BE TRAINED IN EMPLOYMENT. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Toad Hall
Island Farm Road
Ufton Nervet
READING
RG7 4ER
- Phone:
- 07793 196863
- Email:
- enquiries@bsel.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window